MI HB4828 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-23 - Referred To Committee On Insurance And Banking
Pending: Senate Insurance And Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-23 - Referred To Committee On Insurance And Banking
Pending: Senate Insurance And Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Financial institutions: payday lending; legislative report requirement concerning deferred presentment service providers and transactions; revise. Amends sec. 51 of 2005 PA 244 (MCL 487.2171).
Title
Financial institutions: payday lending; legislative report requirement concerning deferred presentment service providers and transactions; revise. Amends sec. 51 of 2005 PA 244 (MCL 487.2171).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 348 (Y: 102 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Insurance And Banking |
2021-06-17 | House | Transmitted |
2021-06-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 348 Yeas 102 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2021-06-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-06-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-06-16 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-06-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-05-26 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-05-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-05-12 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/11/2021 |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Services |
2021-05-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-05-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Cara Clemente |
Subjects
Consumer credit: collection practices
Consumer credit: lending practices
Financial institutions: payday lending
Legislature: reports
State agencies (existing): insurance and financial services
Consumer credit: lending practices
Financial institutions: payday lending
Legislature: reports
State agencies (existing): insurance and financial services