MI HB4822 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-15 - Referred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development
Pending: Senate Economic And Small Business Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-15 - Referred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development
Pending: Senate Economic And Small Business Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Worker's compensation: benefits; COVID-19 presumption for police, firefighters, and emergency medical personnel incurred in the line of duty; provide for compensation eligibility. Amends 1969 PA 317 (MCL 418.101 - 418.941) by adding sec. 406.
Title
Worker's compensation: benefits; COVID-19 presumption for police, firefighters, and emergency medical personnel incurred in the line of duty; provide for compensation eligibility. Amends 1969 PA 317 (MCL 418.101 - 418.941) by adding sec. 406.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Mueller [R] | Rep. TC Clements [R] | Rep. Robert Bezotte [R] | Rep. Terry Sabo [D] |
Rep. Jeffrey Yaroch [R] | Rep. Mark Tisdel [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 407 (Y: 104 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development |
2021-06-30 | House | Transmitted |
2021-06-30 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 407 Yeas 104 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2021-06-30 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-06-30 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-06-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-06-30 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2021-06-30 | House | Substitute (h-1) Not Adopted |
2021-06-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-06-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-06-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-05-12 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/11/2021 |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2021-05-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-05-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Mike Mueller |
Subjects
Corrections: employees
Health occupations: emergency medical services personnel
Law enforcement: fire personnel
Law enforcement: local police
Law enforcement: other
Worker's compensation: benefits
Health occupations: emergency medical services personnel
Law enforcement: fire personnel
Law enforcement: local police
Law enforcement: other
Worker's compensation: benefits