MI HB4812 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Introduced on August 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health; pharmaceuticals; FDA-designated interchangeable biological drug products; allow pharmacists to dispense. Amends secs. 17702, 17704 & 17755 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17702 et seq.).
Title
Health; pharmaceuticals; FDA-designated interchangeable biological drug products; allow pharmacists to dispense. Amends secs. 17702, 17704 & 17755 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17702 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 429 (Y: 101 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 429 (Y: 101 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2015-11-10 | House | Transmitted |
2015-11-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 429 Yeas 101 Nays 5 |
2015-11-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-11-10 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2015-11-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-11-10 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2015-11-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-11-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-11-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2015-08-19 | House | Printed Bill Filed 08/19/2015 |
2015-08-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2015-08-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-08-18 | House | Introduced By Representative John Bizon |
Subjects
Health occupations: pharmacists
Health: pharmaceuticals
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Health: pharmaceuticals
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs