MI HB4811 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Assigned Pa 92'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Agriculture; other; certain food processing standards; modify compliance with federal regulations, and modify certain licensing requirements and fees. Amends secs. 1109, 1111, 3119, 4103 & 7112 of 2000 PA 92 (MCL 289.1109 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4812'17

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture; other; certain food processing standards; modify compliance with federal regulations, and modify certain licensing requirements and fees. Amends secs. 1109, 1111, 3119, 4103 & 7112 of 2000 PA 92 (MCL 289.1109 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4812'17

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-13 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 153 (Y: 101 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 141 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 292 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseAssigned Pa 92'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-04-10HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 3/26/2018 @ 3:12 Pm
2018-04-10HouseApproved By The Governor 3/26/2048 @ 12:18 Pm
2018-03-20HousePresented To The Governor 3/16/2018 @ 10:43 Am
2018-03-13HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-03-13HouseTitle Amendment Agreed To
2018-03-13House Roll Call # 153 Yeas 101 Nays 8
2018-03-13HouseSenate Substitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-03-08HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2018-03-08HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment
2018-03-08SenateInserted Full Title
2018-03-08SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 141 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2018-03-07SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2018-03-07SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-03-07SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-02-28SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2018-02-28SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-02-28SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2017-10-10SenateReferred To Committee On Agriculture
2017-10-05HouseTransmitted
2017-10-05HouseTitle Amended
2017-10-05HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 292 Yeas 108 Nays 0
2017-10-05HouseRead A Third Time
2017-10-04HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-10-04HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2017-10-04HouseRead A Second Time
2017-09-27HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-09-27HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2017-08-16HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 07/12/2017
2017-07-12HouseReferred To Committee On Agriculture
2017-07-12HouseRead A First Time
2017-07-12HouseIntroduced By Representative Roger Victory

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-HB-4811
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2017-HIB-4811.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBH-4811.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBS-4811.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2017-HNB-4811.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0092.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-09-27-070.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-10-05-074.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-02-28-022.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-03-08-026.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-03-13-027.htm

Bill Comments

feedback