MI HB4799 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-1)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-12 - Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-12 - Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; other; coercing female to have an abortion against her will; prohibit, and provide penalties. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 213a.
Title
Crimes; other; coercing female to have an abortion against her will; prohibit, and provide penalties. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 213a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 879 (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 104 (Y: 70 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 103 (Y: 72 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 104 (Y: 70 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 103 (Y: 72 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-12 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-12-12 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Full Title |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 879 Yeas 29 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-03-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2012-03-13 | House | Transmitted |
2012-03-13 | House | Roll Call # 104 Yeas 70 Nays 39 |
2012-03-13 | House | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2012-03-13 | House | Passed Roll Call # 103 Yeas 72 Nays 37 |
2012-03-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-03-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-03-08 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2012-03-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-02-14 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-02-14 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2011-06-23 | House | Printed Bill Filed 06/23/2011 |
2011-06-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2011-06-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-06-22 | House | Introduced By Representative Paul Opsommer |