MI HB4793 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-28 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-28 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing; juveniles who may be sentenced in the same manner as an adult; revise criteria. Amends sec. 1, ch. IX of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 769.1). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4675'17
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing; juveniles who may be sentenced in the same manner as an adult; revise criteria. Amends sec. 1, ch. IX of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 769.1). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4675'17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-11-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-07-12 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/20/2017 |
2017-06-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2017-06-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-06-20 | House | Introduced By Representative Jewell Jones |