MI HB4788 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-27 - Referred To Committee On Elections
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-27 - Referred To Committee On Elections
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Villages: general law; initiative for term limits of elected general law village officers; provide for. Amends 1895 PA 3 (MCL 61.1 - 74.25) by adding sec. 5b to ch. II.
Title
Villages: general law; initiative for term limits of elected general law village officers; provide for. Amends 1895 PA 3 (MCL 61.1 - 74.25) by adding sec. 5b to ch. II.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 424 (Y: 59 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2021-07-21 | House | Transmitted |
2021-07-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 424 Yeas 59 Nays 49 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2021-07-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-07-21 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-07-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-07-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-06-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-06-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-05-06 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/05/2021 |
2021-05-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2021-05-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-05-05 | House | Introduced By Representative Gregory Markkanen |
Subjects
Elections: initiative and referendum
Elections: local
Villages: employees and officers
Villages: general law
Elections: local
Villages: employees and officers
Villages: general law