MI HB4788 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 490'14 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 490'14 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; fund-raising registration plates; fund-raising registration plate for Michigan veterans; create. Amends 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.1 - 257.923) by adding sec. 811x.
Title
Vehicles; fund-raising registration plates; fund-raising registration plate for Michigan veterans; create. Amends 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.1 - 257.923) by adding sec. 811x.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 759 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 760 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 441 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 760 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 441 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 490'14 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/13/2015 @ 3:52 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/10/2015 @ 12:58 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 1/5/2015 @ 3:38 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-18 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-18 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2014-12-18 | House | Roll Call # 759 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2014-12-18 | House | Senate Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2014-12-11 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-12-11 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-3 With Title Amendment |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 760 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2013-12-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2013-12-03 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2013-11-14 | House | Transmitted |
2013-11-14 | House | Passed Roll Call # 441 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2013-11-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-11-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-11-13 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted And Amended |
2013-11-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-11-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-11-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2013-05-30 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/30/2013 |
2013-05-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Military And Veterans Affairs |
2013-05-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-05-29 | House | Introduced By Representative Jim Stamas |