MI HB4783 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on June 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-17 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-17 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; abuse; abuse of a vulnerable child as second degree child abuse; include. Amends sec. 136b of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.136b).
Title
Crimes; abuse; abuse of a vulnerable child as second degree child abuse; include. Amends sec. 136b of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.136b).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-07-02 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 07/02/2019 |
2019-06-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2019-06-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-06-26 | House | Introduced By Representative Bronna Kahle |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4783 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4783.htm |