MI HB4780 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-15 - Assigned Pa 139'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Trade: containers; distribution of bottle deposit fund; modify and earmark. Amends sec. 3c of 1976 IL 1 (MCL 445.573c). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4781'21, HB 4783'21, HB 4782'21

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trade: containers; distribution of bottle deposit fund; modify and earmark. Amends sec. 3c of 1976 IL 1 (MCL 445.573c). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4781'21, HB 4783'21, HB 4782'21

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed By 3/4 Vote Roll Call # 466 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-12-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed By 3/4 Vote Roll Call # 465 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 293 (Y: 106 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-15HouseAssigned Pa 139'21 With Immediate Effect
2021-12-15HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 12/27/2021 12:12 Pm
2021-12-15HouseApproved By The Governor 12/23/2021 10:00 Am
2021-12-14HousePresented To The Governor 12/14/2021 09:42 Am
2021-12-08HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2021-12-08HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect
2021-12-08SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2021-12-08SenatePassed By 3/4 Vote Roll Call # 466 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2021-12-08SenateVote Reconsidered
2021-12-08SenateImmediate Effect Defeated
2021-12-08SenatePassed By 3/4 Vote Roll Call # 465 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 2
2021-12-07SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2021-12-07SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2021-10-06SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2021-10-06SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2021-10-06SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2021-06-08SenateReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2021-06-03HouseTransmitted
2021-06-03HousePassed By 3/4 Vote; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 293 Yeas 106 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2021-06-03HouseRead A Third Time
2021-06-02HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-06-02HouseRead A Second Time
2021-05-27HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-05-27HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2021-05-26HouseReferred To Committee On Rules And Competitiveness
2021-05-25HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-05-25HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2021-05-05HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 05/04/2021
2021-05-04HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2021-05-04HouseRead A First Time
2021-05-04HouseIntroduced By Representative Mike Mueller

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-4780
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-4780.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBH-4780.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billenrolled/House/htm/2021-HNB-4780.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/publicact/htm/2021-PA-0139.htm
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4780-2A4EA85D.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4780-67279614.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4780-5D872210.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4780-L.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4780-F.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4780-B.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-05-25-047.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-06-03-052.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-10-06-077.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-12-08-097.htm

Bill Comments

feedback