MI HB4778 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on November 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-30 - Assigned Pa 114'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

State financing and management: other; state agencies using messaging apps that allow deletion of messages to avoid FOIA: prohibit. Amends 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1101 - 18.1594) by adding sec. 270.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State financing and management: other; state agencies using messaging apps that allow deletion of messages to avoid FOIA: prohibit. Amends 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1101 - 18.1594) by adding sec. 270.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-09 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 538 (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 420 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 363 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-30HouseAssigned Pa 114'21 With Immediate Effect
2021-11-30HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 11/22/2021 12:56 Pm
2021-11-30HouseApproved By The Governor 11/22/2021 10:59 Am
2021-11-10HousePresented To The Governor 11/10/2021 02:44 Pm
2021-11-09HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2021-11-09HouseFull Title Agreed To
2021-11-09HouseRoll Call Roll Call # 538 Yeas 104 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
2021-11-09HouseSenate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
2021-11-02HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2021-11-02HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2021-11-02SenateInserted Full Title
2021-11-02SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 420 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2021-10-27SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2021-10-27SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2021-10-27SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2021-10-20SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2021-10-20SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2021-06-24SenateReferred To Committee On Oversight
2021-06-23HouseTransmitted
2021-06-23HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 363 Yeas 110 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2021-06-23HouseRead A Third Time
2021-06-22HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-06-22HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2021-06-22HouseRead A Second Time
2021-06-09HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-06-09HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2021-05-05HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 05/04/2021
2021-05-04HouseReferred To Committee On Communications And Technology
2021-05-04HouseRead A First Time
2021-05-04HouseIntroduced By Representative Steven Johnson

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-4778
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-4778.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBH-4778.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBS-4778.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billenrolled/House/htm/2021-HNB-4778.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/publicact/htm/2021-PA-0114.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-4778-0N295.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-4778-00B716.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4778-9CE05921.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4778-EC291D56.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4778-96724983.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4778-L.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4778-S.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4778-F.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-06-09-054.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-06-23-060.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-10-20-083.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-11-02-088.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-11-09-094.htm

Bill Comments

feedback