MI HB4773 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-22 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-22 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Weapons; firearms; sentencing guidelines; update references. Amends sec. 12, ch. IX & secs. 11b & 16m, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 769.12 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4770'19
Title
Weapons; firearms; sentencing guidelines; update references. Amends sec. 12, ch. IX & secs. 11b & 16m, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 769.12 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4770'19
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-06-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/26/2019 |
2019-06-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security |
2019-06-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-06-20 | House | Introduced By Representative Matt Maddock |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4773 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4773.htm |