MI HB4768 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Assigned Pa 142'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Assigned Pa 142'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Juveniles; criminal procedure; setting aside juvenile adjudication for completion of the Michigan youth challeNGe academy; provide for. Amends sec. 18e, ch. XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.18e).
Title
Juveniles; criminal procedure; setting aside juvenile adjudication for completion of the Michigan youth challeNGe academy; provide for. Amends sec. 18e, ch. XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.18e).
Sponsors
Sen. John Bizon [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 232 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 328 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 328 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Assigned Pa 142'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-05-10 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/10/2018 @ 10:58 Am |
2018-05-10 | House | Approved By The Governor 5/9/2018 @ 3:44 Pm |
2018-05-02 | House | Presented To The Governor 5/2/2018 @ 9:56 Am |
2018-04-26 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-04-26 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-04-26 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 232 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-10-25 | House | Transmitted |
2017-10-25 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 328 Yeas 106 Nays 0 |
2017-10-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-10-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-10-24 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2017-10-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-10-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-10-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-06-20 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/15/2017 |
2017-06-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-06-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-06-15 | House | Introduced By Representative John Bizon |