MI HB4765 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on July 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-10 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-10 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Animals; animal shelters; adoption of certain seized animals used in fighting operations; allow, and make other revisions. Amends sec. 49 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.49).
Title
Animals; animal shelters; adoption of certain seized animals used in fighting operations; allow, and make other revisions. Amends sec. 49 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.49).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-11-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2015-07-15 | House | Printed Bill Filed 07/15/2015 |
2015-07-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2015-07-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-07-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Michael Mccready |