MI HB4759 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Assigned Pa 106'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Property; conveyances; transfer of certain state-owned property in Ingham County; provide for. Creates land transfer act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property; conveyances; transfer of certain state-owned property in Ingham County; provide for. Creates land transfer act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 312 (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 256 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-16HouseAssigned Pa 106'17 With Immediate Effect
2017-08-16HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 7/13/2017 @ 3:42 Pm
2017-08-16HouseApproved By The Governor 7/13/2017 @ 12:15 Pm
2017-07-12HousePresented To The Governor 7/10/2017 @ 1:52 Pm
2017-07-12HouseBill Ordered Enrolled 06/28/2017
2017-07-12HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect
2017-06-28SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 312 Yeas 26 Nays 9 Excused 2 Not Voting 1
2017-06-22SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2017-06-22SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2017-06-21SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2017-06-21SenateRules Suspended
2017-06-20HouseTransmitted
2017-06-20HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 256 Yeas 107 Nays 0
2017-06-20HouseRead A Third Time
2017-06-20HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2017-06-20HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-06-20HouseRead A Second Time
2017-06-20HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-06-20HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2017-06-15HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 06/14/2017
2017-06-14HouseReferred To Committee On Government Operations
2017-06-14HouseRead A First Time
2017-06-14HouseIntroduced By Representative Andy Schor

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback