MI HB4755 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-01 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-01 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; animals; ownership of animals by a person convicted by certain crimes against animals; require court to prohibit for a period of at least 5 years. Amends secs. 49, 50 & 50b of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.49 et seq.).
Title
Crimes; animals; ownership of animals by a person convicted by certain crimes against animals; require court to prohibit for a period of at least 5 years. Amends secs. 49, 50 & 50b of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.49 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 422 (Y: 93 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 422 (Y: 93 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-06-12 | House | Transmitted |
2014-06-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 422 Yeas 93 Nays 17 |
2014-06-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-06-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-06-11 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2014-06-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-02-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-02-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2014-01-22 | House | Recommendation Concurred In |
2014-01-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Judiciary |
2013-05-22 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/22/2013 |
2013-05-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2013-05-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-05-21 | House | Introduced By Representative Harvey Santana |
Same As/Similar To
SB0386 (Same As) 2013-10-17 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2