MI HB4751 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-30 - Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-30 - Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Family law; marriage and divorce; enforceability of prenuptial agreements; clarify. Amends sec. 8 of 1981 PA 216 (MCL 557.28).
Title
Family law; marriage and divorce; enforceability of prenuptial agreements; clarify. Amends sec. 8 of 1981 PA 216 (MCL 557.28).
Sponsors
Rep. Klint Kesto [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 329 (Y: 63 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 329 (Y: 63 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2017-10-26 | House | Transmitted |
2017-10-26 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 329 Yeas 63 Nays 43 |
2017-10-26 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-10-25 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-10-25 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2017-10-25 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-10-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-10-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-06-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/13/2017 |
2017-06-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2017-06-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-06-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Klint Kesto |