MI HB4748 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - Referred To Committee On Elections And Government Reform
Pending: Senate Elections And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Elections; candidates; candidate filing fee in lieu of nominating petitions for township offices; allow, and make nonrefundable. Amends sec. 349 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.349). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4745'17, HB 4746'17, HB 4747'17, HB 4749'17, HB 4750'17

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; candidates; candidate filing fee in lieu of nominating petitions for township offices; allow, and make nonrefundable. Amends sec. 349 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.349). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4745'17, HB 4746'17, HB 4747'17, HB 4749'17, HB 4750'17

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 444 (Y: 94 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-05SenateReferred To Committee On Elections And Government Reform
2018-05-30HouseTransmitted
2018-05-30HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 444 Yeas 94 Nays 13
2018-05-30HouseRead A Third Time
2018-05-29HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-05-29HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2018-05-29HouseRead A Second Time
2018-05-17HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-05-17HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2017-06-14HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 06/13/2017
2017-06-13HouseReferred To Committee On Elections And Ethics
2017-06-13HouseRead A First Time
2017-06-13HouseIntroduced By Representative Julie Calley

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback