MI HB4737 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-30 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-30 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Health: abortion; performing, inducing, or attempting to perform or induce an abortion on a pregnant woman who is seeking the abortion because of race, sex, or a disability; prohibit, and provide penalties. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 14a.
Title
Health: abortion; performing, inducing, or attempting to perform or induce an abortion on a pregnant woman who is seeking the abortion because of race, sex, or a disability; prohibit, and provide penalties. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 14a.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2021-05-04 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/29/2021 |
2021-04-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2021-04-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-04-29 | House | Introduced By Representative Julie Calley |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-4737 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-4737.htm |