MI HB4735 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Referred To Committee On Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Referred To Committee On Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources: wildlife; use of certain data requested under the freedom of information act to take game; penalize. Amends sec. 40118 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.40118). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4736'19
Title
Natural resources: wildlife; use of certain data requested under the freedom of information act to take game; penalize. Amends sec. 40118 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.40118). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4736'19
Sponsors
Rep. Scott VanSingel [R] | Sen. John Cherry [D] | Rep. Leslie Love [D] | Rep. Julie Brixie [D] |
Rep. Tim Sneller [D] | Rep. Rachel Hood [D] | Rep. Padma Kuppa [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 104 (Y: 87 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2020-02-25 | House | Transmitted |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 104 Yeas 87 Nays 20 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-02-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-02-20 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-01-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-09-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-06-20 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/20/2019 |
2019-06-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation |
2019-06-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-06-19 | House | Introduced By Representative Scott Vansingel |