MI HB4726 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 57-29)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 496'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 57-29)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 496'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Employment security; benefits; volunteer firefighters compensation; exclude from unemployment benefit calculation. Amends sec. 27 of 1936 (Ex Sess) PA 1 (MCL 421.27).
Title
Employment security; benefits; volunteer firefighters compensation; exclude from unemployment benefit calculation. Amends sec. 27 of 1936 (Ex Sess) PA 1 (MCL 421.27).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 848 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 957 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 319 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 957 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 319 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 496'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2012 @ 1:36 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/27/2012 @ 9:52 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-27 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/21/2012 @ 11:44 Am |
2012-12-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | House | Roll Call # 848 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2012-12-13 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2012-12-13 | House | Rule Suspended |
2012-12-13 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 957 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2011-09-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development |
2011-09-07 | House | Transmitted |
2011-09-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 319 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2011-09-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-06-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-06-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-06-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-06-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2011-06-14 | House | Printed Bill Filed 06/10/2011 |
2011-06-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2011-06-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-06-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Al Pscholka |