MI HB4713 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Assigned Pa 58'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Assigned Pa 58'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crimes of possession of a trailer designed for defense or attack; remove to reflect repeal. Amends sec. 16u, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16u). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4712'19
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crimes of possession of a trailer designed for defense or attack; remove to reflect repeal. Amends sec. 16u, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16u). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4712'19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 80 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 378 (Y: 95 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 378 (Y: 95 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Assigned Pa 58'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-03-10 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 03/10/2020 02:14 Pm |
2020-03-10 | House | Approved By The Governor 03/10/2020 01:42 Pm |
2020-03-03 | House | Presented To The Governor 02/27/2020 03:06 Pm |
2020-02-26 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-02-26 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 80 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2019-12-11 | House | Transmitted |
2019-12-11 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 378 Yeas 95 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-12-11 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-12-11 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-12-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-12-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-06-12 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/12/2019 |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-06-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-06-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Aaron Miller |