MI HB4712 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 26 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Presented To The Governor 02/27/2020 03:04 Pm
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Crimes; other; possession of a trailer designed for defense or attack; repeal. Repeals sec. 421 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.421).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes; other; possession of a trailer designed for defense or attack; repeal. Repeals sec. 421 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.421).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 377 (Y: 96 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27HousePresented To The Governor 02/27/2020 03:04 Pm
2020-02-26HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2020-02-26HouseFull Title Agreed To
2020-02-26HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2020-02-26SenateInserted Full Title
2020-02-26SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 79 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-02-25SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2020-02-25SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2020-02-18SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2020-02-18SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2020-02-18SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2020-01-08SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
2019-12-11HouseTransmitted
2019-12-11HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 377 Yeas 96 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2019-12-11HouseRead A Third Time
2019-12-11HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-12-11HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-12-11HouseRead A Second Time
2019-12-03HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-12-03HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2019-06-12HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 06/12/2019
2019-06-11HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2019-06-11HouseRead A First Time
2019-06-11HouseIntroduced By Representative Steven Johnson

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback