MI HB4710 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-05 - Assigned Pa 140'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-05 - Assigned Pa 140'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health occupations: acupuncturists; licensure of acupuncturist; provide for. Amends heading of pt. 165 and secs. 16215, 16322, 16501, 16511, 16521, 16525 & 16529 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16215 et seq.) & adds secs. 16513, 16515 & 16517.
Title
Health occupations: acupuncturists; licensure of acupuncturist; provide for. Amends heading of pt. 165 and secs. 16215, 16322, 16501, 16511, 16521, 16525 & 16529 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16215 et seq.) & adds secs. 16513, 16515 & 16517.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 306 (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 227 (Y: 100 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 227 (Y: 100 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-05 | House | Assigned Pa 140'19 With Immediate Effect |
2019-12-05 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/05/2019 09:28 Am |
2019-12-05 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/04/2019 02:11 Pm |
2019-12-03 | House | Presented To The Governor 11/25/2019 03:03 Pm |
2019-11-20 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2019-11-20 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2019-11-20 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 306 Yeas 30 Nays 6 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2019-09-19 | House | Transmitted |
2019-09-19 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2019-09-19 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 227 Yeas 100 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-09-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-09-19 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-09-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-09-19 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2019-09-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-09-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-09-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2019-09-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2) |
2019-06-12 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/12/2019 |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2019-09-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-06-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Bronna Kahle |
Subjects
Health occupations: acupuncturists
Occupations: individual licensing and registration
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Occupations: individual licensing and registration
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs