MI HB4709 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Veterans
Pending: Senate Families, Seniors And Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Children: protection; child protection law; include reporting requirements to the legislative oversight committees. Amends 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.621 - 722.638) by adding sec. 9b.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children: protection; child protection law; include reporting requirements to the legislative oversight committees. Amends 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.621 - 722.638) by adding sec. 9b.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 20 (Y: 103 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21SenateReferred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Veterans
2020-01-16HouseTransmitted
2020-01-16HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 20 Yeas 103 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
2020-01-16HouseRead A Third Time
2020-01-14HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-01-14HouseRead A Second Time
2019-12-10HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-12-10HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2019-09-18HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2019-06-12HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 06/12/2019
2019-06-11HouseReferred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors
2019-06-11HouseIntroduced By Representative David Lagrand

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback