MI HB4689 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 19 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Presented To The Governor 02/24/2020 11:40 Am
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Construction; other; temporary door barricade devices in school buildings; allow, and provide standards. Amends title & sec. 5a of 1937 PA 306 (MCL 388.855a) & adds sec. 1d.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Construction; other; temporary door barricade devices in school buildings; allow, and provide standards. Amends title & sec. 5a of 1937 PA 306 (MCL 388.855a) & adds sec. 1d.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 46 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 303 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06HousePresented To The Governor 02/24/2020 11:40 Am
2020-02-20HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2020-02-20HouseRoll Call Roll Call # 84 Yeas 106 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
2020-02-20HouseSenate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
2020-02-20HouseEnrollment Vacated
2020-02-19HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2020-02-19HouseRoll Call Roll Call # 66 Yeas 108 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2020-02-19HouseSenate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
2020-02-18HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2020-02-18HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect
2020-02-13SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 46 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2020-02-11SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) As Amended
2020-02-11SenateSubstitute (s-1) As Amended Concurred In
2020-02-11SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) And Amendment(s)
2019-12-11SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2019-12-11SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-12-11SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2019-11-07SenateReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2019-11-05HouseTransmitted
2019-11-05HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 303 Yeas 108 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2019-11-05HouseRead A Third Time
2019-10-30HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-10-30HouseSubstitute (h-2) Adopted
2019-10-30HouseRead A Second Time
2019-10-22HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-10-22HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2)
2019-10-15HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2)
2019-06-04HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 06/06/2019
2019-06-05HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2019-06-05HouseRead A First Time
2019-06-05HouseIntroduced By Representative Scott Vansingel

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4689
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4689.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBH-4689.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBS-4689.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2019-HNB-4689.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-10-22-099.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-11-05-105.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-12-11-115.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-02-13-016.htm

Bill Comments

feedback