MI HB4687 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-08 - Re-referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-08 - Re-referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources: hunting; feeding or baiting deer; allow. Amends secs. 40102, 40111a & 43527a of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.40102 et seq.).
Title
Natural resources: hunting; feeding or baiting deer; allow. Amends secs. 40102, 40111a & 43527a of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.40102 et seq.).
Sponsors
Sen. Michele Hoitenga [R] | Rep. Julie Alexander [R] | Rep. Steven Johnson [R] | Rep. Mike Mueller [R] |
Rep. Beau LaFave [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-03 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 330 (Y: 61 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 317 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-11-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Amendment(s) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 312 (Y: 57 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 317 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-11-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Amendment(s) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 312 (Y: 57 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2019-12-19 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 12/18/2019 |
2019-12-10 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/09/2019 10:19 Am |
2019-12-03 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2019-12-03 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2019-12-03 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 330 Yeas 61 Nays 44 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2019-11-20 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2019-11-20 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Full Title |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 317 Yeas 21 Nays 14 Excused 2 Not Voting 1 |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Amendment(s) |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2019-11-05 | House | Transmitted |
2019-11-05 | House | Title Amended |
2019-11-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 312 Yeas 57 Nays 49 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2019-11-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-11-05 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-11-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-11-05 | House | Amended |
2019-11-05 | House | Postponed Temporarily |
2019-11-05 | House | Amended |
2019-11-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-11-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-11-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-06-05 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/05/2019 |
2019-06-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2019-06-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-06-04 | House | Introduced By Representative Michele Hoitenga |