MI HB4680 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-10 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-10 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Legislature: other; committee to enforce ethics; create. Amends title & sec. 7 of 1968 PA 318 (MCL 15.307). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4682'21, HB 4683'21, HB 4685'21, HB 4681'21
Title
Legislature: other; committee to enforce ethics; create. Amends title & sec. 7 of 1968 PA 318 (MCL 15.307). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4682'21, HB 4683'21, HB 4685'21, HB 4681'21
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Fink [R] | Rep. John Roth [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 305 (Y: 72 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2021-06-09 | House | Transmitted |
2021-06-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 305 Yeas 72 Nays 37 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2021-06-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-06-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-06-08 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2021-06-08 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-06-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-04-22 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/21/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2021-04-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-04-21 | House | Introduced By Representative Andrew Fink |