MI HB4679 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-25 - Assigned Pa 340'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-25 - Assigned Pa 340'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Legislature; reports; fiscal note on the financial impact of legislation; require. Amends 1986 PA 268 (MCL 4.1101 - 4.1901) by adding secs. 502 & 602.
Title
Legislature; reports; fiscal note on the financial impact of legislation; require. Amends 1986 PA 268 (MCL 4.1101 - 4.1901) by adding secs. 502 & 602.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Lilly [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-09-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 558 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-09-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 559 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-09-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 337 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 559 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-09-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 337 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-25 | House | Assigned Pa 340'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-09-25 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 9/13/2018 @ 9:12 Am |
2018-09-25 | House | Approved By The Governor 9/12/2018 @ 11:48 Am |
2018-09-25 | House | Presented To The Governor 9/11/2018 @ 9:30 Am |
2018-09-05 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-09-05 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-09-05 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 558 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2018-05-17 | House | Transmitted |
2018-05-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 337 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2018-05-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-05-16 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2018-05-16 | House | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted |
2018-05-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-12-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-12-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-05-31 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/30/2017 |
2017-05-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2017-05-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-05-30 | House | Introduced By Representative Jim Lilly |