MI HB4678 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-28 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-28 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
State agencies (existing); corrections; permissible purposes for closing open meeting to include discussion of certain information by family advisory board; establish. Amends sec. 8 of 1976 PA 267 (MCL 15.268). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4677'17
Title
State agencies (existing); corrections; permissible purposes for closing open meeting to include discussion of certain information by family advisory board; establish. Amends sec. 8 of 1976 PA 267 (MCL 15.268). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4677'17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-11-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-05-31 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/30/2017 |
2017-05-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2017-05-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-05-30 | House | Introduced By Representative Martin Howrylak |