MI HB4675 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-19 - Assigned Pa 78'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-19 - Assigned Pa 78'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crime victims: compensation; compensation for survivors of crimes that result in injury; expand. Amends secs 5, 10 & 12 of 1976 PA 223 (MCL 18.355 et seq.) & adds sec. 16a.
Title
Crime victims: compensation; compensation for survivors of crimes that result in injury; expand. Amends secs 5, 10 & 12 of 1976 PA 223 (MCL 18.355 et seq.) & adds sec. 16a.
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Slagh [R] | Rep. Bronna Kahle [R] | Rep. Bryan Posthumus [R] | Rep. Tyrone Carter [D] |
Rep. Julie Calley [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 202 (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 591 (Y: 96 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 591 (Y: 96 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | House | Assigned Pa 78'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-05-19 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 05/19/2022 11:30 Am |
2022-05-19 | House | Approved By The Governor 05/19/2022 10:42 Am |
2022-05-11 | House | Presented To The Governor 05/11/2022 09:15 Am |
2022-05-05 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-05-05 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 202 Yeas 33 Nays 1 Excused 4 Not Voting 0 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2021-12-08 | House | Transmitted |
2021-12-08 | House | Title Amended |
2021-12-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 591 Yeas 96 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2021-12-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-12-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-12-07 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2021-12-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-11-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-11-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2021-04-22 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/21/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Rules And Competitiveness |
2021-04-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-04-21 | House | Introduced By Representative Bradley Slagh |