MI HB4671 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-09 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-09 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Corrections: prisoners; corrections code of 1953; update to reflect creation of productivity credits. Amends secs. 33, 33c, 34 & 35 of 1953 PA 232 (MCL 791.233 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4670'21
Title
Corrections: prisoners; corrections code of 1953; update to reflect creation of productivity credits. Amends secs. 33, 33c, 34 & 35 of 1953 PA 232 (MCL 791.233 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4670'21
Sponsors
Rep. Tyrone Carter [D] | Rep. Bronna Kahle [R] | Rep. Bradley Slagh [R] | Rep. Bryan Posthumus [R] |
Rep. Julie Calley [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-11-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-11-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-04-22 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/21/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Rules And Competitiveness |
2021-04-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-04-21 | House | Introduced By Representative Tyrone Carter |