MI HB4669 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation: funds; irrevocable trust fund for bonds issued on road projects; provide for. Amends sec. 11 of 1951 PA 51 (MCL 247.661) & adds sec. 18n.
Title
Transportation: funds; irrevocable trust fund for bonds issued on road projects; provide for. Amends sec. 11 of 1951 PA 51 (MCL 247.661) & adds sec. 18n.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 207 (Y: 58 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2021-05-13 | House | Transmitted |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 207 Yeas 58 Nays 49 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2021-05-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-04-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-04-22 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/21/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2021-04-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-04-21 | House | Introduced By Representative Scott Vansingel |