MI HB4654 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-18 - Assigned Pa 125'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Occupations; alarm systems; installation of certain business monitoring systems without electrician's permit; authorize for registered or licensed security alarm providers. Amends sec. 733 of 2016 PA 407 (MCL 339.5733).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupations; alarm systems; installation of certain business monitoring systems without electrician's permit; authorize for registered or licensed security alarm providers. Amends sec. 733 of 2016 PA 407 (MCL 339.5733).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 356 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 209 (Y: 97 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-18HouseAssigned Pa 125'17 With Immediate Effect
2017-10-18HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 10/17/2017 @ 2:10 Pm
2017-10-18HouseApproved By The Governor 10/17/2017 @ 12:13 Pm
2017-10-10HousePresented To The Governor 10/10/2017 @ 1:07 Pm
2017-10-04HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2017-10-04HouseFull Title Agreed To
2017-10-04HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2017-10-04SenateInserted Full Title
2017-10-04SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 356 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2017-10-03SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2017-10-03SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2017-09-19SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2017-09-19SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-09-19SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2017-06-22SenateReferred To Committee On Energy And Technology
2017-06-22SenateDischarge Committee Approved
2017-06-21SenateReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2017-06-15HouseTransmitted
2017-06-15HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 209 Yeas 97 Nays 10
2017-06-15HouseRead A Third Time
2017-06-13HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-06-13HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2017-06-13HouseRead A Second Time
2017-06-06HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-06-06HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2017-05-25HousePer Rule 41 Referred To Committee On Communications And Technology
2017-05-25HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 05/24/2017
2017-05-24HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2017-05-24HouseRead A First Time
2017-05-24HouseIntroduced By Representative Michele Hoitenga

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-HB-4654
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2017-HIB-4654.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBH-4654.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBS-4654.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2017-HNB-4654.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2017-PA-0125.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-06-06-053.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-06-15-058.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-09-19-072.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-10-04-078.htm

Bill Comments

feedback