MI HB4652 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-18 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-18 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recreation; other; ski area permit fees; increase. Amends sec. 16 of 1962 PA 199 (MCL 408.336).
Title
Recreation; other; ski area permit fees; increase. Amends sec. 16 of 1962 PA 199 (MCL 408.336).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2019-05-23 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/23/2019 |
2019-05-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2019-05-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-05-22 | House | Introduced By Representative Thomas Albert |
Subjects
Recreation: other
Recreation: outdoor activities
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Recreation: outdoor activities
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs