MI HB4647 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-21 - Referred To Committee On Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-21 - Referred To Committee On Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Retirement; public school employees; defined contribution only for employees hired after certain date; require, and provide for other general amendments. Amends secs. 5, 41, 81d, 127 & 131 of 1980 PA 300 (MCL 38.1305 et seq.) & adds secs. 21a & 133.
Title
Retirement; public school employees; defined contribution only for employees hired after certain date; require, and provide for other general amendments. Amends secs. 5, 41, 81d, 127 & 131 of 1980 PA 300 (MCL 38.1305 et seq.) & adds secs. 21a & 133.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 211 (Y: 55 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2017-06-15 | House | Transmitted |
2017-06-15 | House | Title Amended |
2017-06-15 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 211 Yeas 55 Nays 52 |
2017-06-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-06-15 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-06-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-06-15 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2017-06-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-06-14 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-06-14 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-05-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/23/2017 |
2017-05-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Education Reform |
2017-05-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-05-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Thomas Albert |
Subjects
Retirement: defined benefit
Retirement: defined contribution
Retirement: investments
Retirement: public school employees
Retirement: defined contribution
Retirement: investments
Retirement: public school employees