MI HB4646 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Assigned Pa 117'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Assigned Pa 117'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Children; adoption; temporary placement, consent, and release; provide for general revisions. Amends secs. 23d, 29 & 44, ch. X of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 710.23d et seq.).
Title
Children; adoption; temporary placement, consent, and release; provide for general revisions. Amends secs. 23d, 29 & 44, ch. X of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 710.23d et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 174 (Y: 98 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 174 (Y: 98 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 168 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 186 (Y: 100 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 174 (Y: 98 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 168 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 186 (Y: 100 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | House | Assigned Pa 117'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-04-17 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 4/15/2014 @ 3:56 Pm |
2014-04-17 | House | Approved By The Governor 4/15/2014 @ 11:32 Am |
2014-04-17 | House | Presented To The Governor 4/3/2014 @ 3:12 Pm |
2014-03-27 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-03-27 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-03-27 | House | Roll Call # 174 Yeas 98 Nays 10 |
2014-03-27 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2014-03-27 | House | Rule Suspended |
2014-03-27 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-03-27 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 168 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Defeated |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 As Amended |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Substitute S-2 As Amended Concurred In |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 And Amendment(s) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2013-06-04 | House | Transmitted |
2013-06-04 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 186 Yeas 100 Nays 9 |
2013-06-04 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-05-23 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-05-23 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2013-05-23 | House | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted |
2013-05-23 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-05-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-05-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2013-05-01 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/01/2013 |
2013-04-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2013-04-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-04-30 | House | Introduced By Representative Mike Shirkey |