MI HB4636 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Assigned Pa 68'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Assigned Pa 68'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; other; procedures of clitoridectomy, infibulation, or other female genital mutilation; prohibit, and provide penalties. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 136.
Title
Crimes; other; procedures of clitoridectomy, infibulation, or other female genital mutilation; prohibit, and provide penalties. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 136.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 220 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 271 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 187 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 271 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 187 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | House | Assigned Pa 68'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-07-12 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/11/2017 @ 1:00 Pm |
2017-07-12 | House | Approved By The Governor 7/11/2017 @ 11:45 Am |
2017-07-12 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/27/2017 @ 11:56 Am |
2017-06-20 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-20 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-06-20 | House | Roll Call # 220 Yeas 105 Nays 2 |
2017-06-20 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2017-06-15 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2017-06-15 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 271 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-06-08 | House | Transmitted |
2017-06-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 187 Yeas 105 Nays 2 |
2017-06-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-06-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-06-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-06-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-06-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-05-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/23/2017 |
2017-05-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2017-05-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-05-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Michele Hoitenga |