MI HB4636 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Assigned Pa 114'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Assigned Pa 114'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; insurance; sale of insurance for self-service storage units; eliminate license requirement. Amends sec. 1202 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.1202).
Title
Occupations; insurance; sale of insurance for self-service storage units; eliminate license requirement. Amends sec. 1202 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.1202).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 207 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 326 (Y: 71 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 326 (Y: 71 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | House | Assigned Pa 114'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-05-11 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/10/2016 @ 1:06 Pm |
2016-05-11 | House | Approved By The Governor 5/10/2016 @ 8:26 Am |
2016-05-04 | House | Presented To The Governor 5/3/2016 @ 12:36 Pm |
2016-04-28 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-04-28 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-04-28 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 207 Yeas 33 Nays 3 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-09-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2015-09-29 | House | Transmitted |
2015-09-29 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 326 Yeas 71 Nays 34 |
2015-09-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-09-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-09-24 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2015-09-24 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2015-09-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-09-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-09-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-05-26 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/22/2015 |
2015-05-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2015-05-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-05-21 | House | Introduced By Representative Bruce Rendon |