MI HB4616 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-28 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-28 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Local government; other; prohibition of local ordinances dealing with pistols and other firearms; clarify penalties and provide for certain notices. Amends title of 1990 PA 319 (MCL 123.1101 - 123.1105) & adds secs. 4a, 4b & 4c.
Title
Local government; other; prohibition of local ordinances dealing with pistols and other firearms; clarify penalties and provide for certain notices. Amends title of 1990 PA 319 (MCL 123.1101 - 123.1105) & adds secs. 4a, 4b & 4c.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Howell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 281 (Y: 69 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2017-09-27 | House | Transmitted |
2017-09-27 | House | Title Amended |
2017-09-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 281 Yeas 69 Nays 39 |
2017-09-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-09-27 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-09-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-09-27 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted And Amended |
2017-09-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-06-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-06-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2017-05-18 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/17/2017 |
2017-05-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2017-05-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-05-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Gary Howell |
Subjects
Cities: ordinances
Counties: ordinances
Courts: district court
Local government: other
Townships: ordinances
Villages: ordinances
Weapons: firearms
Counties: ordinances
Courts: district court
Local government: other
Townships: ordinances
Villages: ordinances
Weapons: firearms