MI HB4600 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; equipment; child restraint safety seats; require positioning of car seats to depend on weight of child, and make other revisions. Amends secs. 710d, 710e & 907 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.710d et seq.).
Title
Vehicles; equipment; child restraint safety seats; require positioning of car seats to depend on weight of child, and make other revisions. Amends secs. 710d, 710e & 907 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.710d et seq.).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2) |
2019-05-16 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/16/2019 |
2019-05-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2019-05-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-05-15 | House | Introduced By Representative Julie Alexander |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4600 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4600.htm |