MI HB4597 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-23 - Printed Bill Filed 04/19/2013
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-23 - Printed Bill Filed 04/19/2013
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Health; abortion; health professional or facility seeking reimbursement from qualified health plan for elective abortion; prohibit unless coverage is by optional rider. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding secs. 16240 & 20195. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4065'13, HB 4066'13
Title
Health; abortion; health professional or facility seeking reimbursement from qualified health plan for elective abortion; prohibit unless coverage is by optional rider. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding secs. 16240 & 20195. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4065'13, HB 4066'13
Sponsors
Rep. Amanda Price [R] | Sen. Roger Victory [R] | Sen. Dan Lauwers [R] | Rep. Bruce Rendon [R] |
Rep. Philip Potvin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | House | Printed Bill Filed 04/19/2013 |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2013-04-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-04-18 | House | Introduced By Representative Amanda Price |
Same As/Similar To
SB0139 (Same As) 2013-02-05 - Referred To Committee On Insurance
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2013-HB-4597 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billintroduced/House/htm/2013-HIB-4597.htm |