MI HB4587 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Civil procedure: evictions; late payment fees; allow limited fees to be awarded in summary proceedings. Amends secs. 5741 & 5750 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.5741 & 600.5750).
Title
Civil procedure: evictions; late payment fees; allow limited fees to be awarded in summary proceedings. Amends secs. 5741 & 5750 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.5741 & 600.5750).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 156 (Y: 80 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2020-03-12 | House | Transmitted |
2020-03-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 156 Yeas 80 Nays 27 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-03-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-03-11 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2020-03-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-05-16 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/16/2019 |
2019-05-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-05-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-05-15 | House | Introduced By Representative Jason Sheppard |