MI HB4585 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Crimes; public office and officers; prohibit and provide penalties for targeting a victim based on his or her actual or perceived employment criteria. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 479d.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes; public office and officers; prohibit and provide penalties for targeting a victim based on his or her actual or perceived employment criteria. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 479d.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 41 (Y: 94 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 38 (Y: 93 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-03-08SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-03-08SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2018-02-06SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2018-01-31HouseTransmitted
2018-01-31HousePassed Roll Call # 41 Yeas 94 Nays 15
2018-01-31HouseVote Reconsidered
2018-01-31HouseTitle Amended
2018-01-31HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 38 Yeas 93 Nays 16
2018-01-31HouseRead A Third Time
2018-01-31HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-01-31HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-01-31HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2018-01-31HouseRead A Second Time
2017-10-03HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-10-03HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2017-05-09HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 05/04/2017
2017-05-04HouseReferred To Committee On Law And Justice
2017-05-04HouseRead A First Time
2017-05-04HouseIntroduced By Representative Jeff Yaroch

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback