MI HB4584 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-21 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Health; occupations; requirement for medical provider to provide information concerning resources available to the parent of a newborn child with spina bifida; provide for. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 5822.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health; occupations; requirement for medical provider to provide information concerning resources available to the parent of a newborn child with spina bifida; provide for. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 5822.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 231 (Y: 64 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-21SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2017-06-20HouseTransmitted
2017-06-20HouseRep. Pam Faris Removed As Cosponsor
2017-06-20HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 231 Yeas 64 Nays 43
2017-06-20HouseRead A Third Time
2017-06-14HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-06-14HouseSubstitute H-2 Adopted And Amended
2017-06-14HouseRead A Second Time
2017-05-31HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-05-31HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2
2017-05-09HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 05/04/2017
2017-05-04HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2017-05-04HouseRead A First Time
2017-05-04HouseIntroduced By Representative Hank Vaupel

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback