MI HB4584 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-27 - Assigned Pa 125'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-27 - Assigned Pa 125'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; business licensing and regulation; regulatory act for professional employer organizations; revise license term and effective and implementation dates. Amends secs. 7, 9, 13, 15, 17, 21, 23 & 27 of 2010 PA 370 (MCL 338.3727 et seq.).
Title
Occupations; business licensing and regulation; regulatory act for professional employer organizations; revise license term and effective and implementation dates. Amends secs. 7, 9, 13, 15, 17, 21, 23 & 27 of 2010 PA 370 (MCL 338.3727 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-30 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 258 (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 380 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 190 (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 380 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 190 (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-27 | House | Assigned Pa 125'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-07-27 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/21/2011 @ 8:50 Am |
2011-07-27 | House | Approved By The Governor 7/19/2011 @ 10:57 Am |
2011-07-27 | House | Presented To The Governor 7/8/2011 @ 11:33 Am |
2011-06-30 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2011-06-30 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2011-06-30 | House | Roll Call # 258 Yeas 104 Nays 3 |
2011-06-30 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2011-06-29 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2011-06-29 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 380 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-06-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2011-06-23 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-06-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-06-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Reforms, Restructuring And Reinventing |
2011-06-14 | House | Transmitted |
2011-06-14 | House | Title Amended |
2011-06-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 190 Yeas 104 Nays 3 |
2011-06-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-06-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-06-09 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2011-06-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-05-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-05-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2011-04-27 | House | Printed Bill Filed 04/27/2011 |
2011-04-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2011-04-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-04-26 | House | Introduced By Representative Paul Opsommer |
Subjects
Occupations, business licensing and regulation
Occupations, employment agencies
State agencies (existing), energy, labor, and economic growth
Occupations, employment agencies
State agencies (existing), energy, labor, and economic growth