MI HB4562 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Assigned Pa 28'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Assigned Pa 28'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Corrections: parole; parole board review process; modify. Amends sec. 33e of 1953 PA 232 (MCL 791.233e).
Title
Corrections: parole; parole board review process; modify. Amends sec. 33e of 1953 PA 232 (MCL 791.233e).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 91 (Y: 95 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 51 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 301 (Y: 101 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 51 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 301 (Y: 101 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Assigned Pa 28'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-03-10 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 03/11/2022 10:50 Am |
2022-03-10 | House | Approved By The Governor 03/11/2022 10:05 Am |
2022-03-03 | House | Presented To The Governor 03/04/2022 02:40 Pm |
2022-03-03 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-03-03 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-03-03 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 91 Yeas 95 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2022-03-03 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2022-03-03 | House | Rule Suspended |
2022-03-03 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2022-03-03 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 51 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2021-06-08 | House | Transmitted |
2021-06-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 301 Yeas 101 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2021-06-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-06-03 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-06-03 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2021-06-03 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-05-18 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-05-18 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) |
2021-03-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/23/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2021-03-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Sarah Lightner |