MI HB4562 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Assigned Pa 111'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Assigned Pa 111'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Agriculture; other; agricultural disaster loan origination program act; recodify and update reference to sales tax exemption. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4561'17
Title
Agriculture; other; agricultural disaster loan origination program act; recodify and update reference to sales tax exemption. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4561'17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 219 (Y: 97 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 183 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 175 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 183 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 175 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned Pa 111'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-04-26 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 4/25/2018 @ 1:28 Pm |
2018-04-26 | House | Approved By The Governor 4/25/2018 @ 1:08 Pm |
2018-04-19 | House | Presented To The Governor 4/18/2018 @ 2:12 Pm |
2018-04-12 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-04-12 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-04-12 | House | Roll Call # 219 Yeas 97 Nays 11 |
2018-04-12 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-03-22 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-03-22 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 183 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2017-06-06 | House | Transmitted |
2017-06-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 175 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2017-06-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-05-31 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-05-31 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-05-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-05-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-05-03 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/02/2017 |
2017-05-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2017-05-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-05-02 | House | Introduced By Representative Curt Vanderwall |