MI HB4548 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-09 - Assigned Pa 153'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-09 - Assigned Pa 153'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; intoxication or impairment; blood alcohol level requirement for certain alcohol-related driving violations; eliminate sunset for .08 limit. Amends secs. 625, 625a, 625g & 625m of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.625 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4547'17
Title
Crimes; intoxication or impairment; blood alcohol level requirement for certain alcohol-related driving violations; eliminate sunset for .08 limit. Amends secs. 625, 625a, 625g & 625m of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.625 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4547'17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-24 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 324 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 418 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-10-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 268 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 418 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-10-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 268 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-09 | House | Assigned Pa 153'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-11-09 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/8/2017 @ 4:24 Pm |
2017-11-09 | House | Approved By The Governor 11/8/2017 @ 11:52 Am |
2017-10-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/31/2017 @ 2:00 Pm |
2017-10-24 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2017-10-24 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-10-24 | House | Roll Call # 324 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2017-10-24 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2017-10-19 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2017-10-19 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 418 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-10-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-10-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-10-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-09-12 | House | Transmitted |
2017-09-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 268 Yeas 106 Nays 1 |
2017-09-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-09-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-09-06 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2017-09-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-06-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-06-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2017-05-02 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/27/2017 |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2017-04-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-04-27 | House | Introduced By Representative Patrick Green |