MI HB4541 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Assigned Pa 43'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Assigned Pa 43'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles: other; street cars; modify motor vehicle code to provide for. Amends secs. 42, 46, 48, 49, 63, 69, 618a, 634, 660, 660a, 660d, 673, 674, 675d & 676b of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.42 et seq.) & adds secs. 63a, 64a, 64b & ch. VIA.
Title
Vehicles: other; street cars; modify motor vehicle code to provide for. Amends secs. 42, 46, 48, 49, 63, 69, 618a, 634, 660, 660a, 660d, 673, 674, 675d & 676b of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.42 et seq.) & adds secs. 63a, 64a, 64b & ch. VIA.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 355 (Y: 92 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 287 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 167 (Y: 93 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 287 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 167 (Y: 93 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | House | Assigned Pa 43'21 With Immediate Effect |
2021-07-01 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/01/2021 01:24 Pm |
2021-07-01 | House | Approved By The Governor 07/01/2021 10:40 Am |
2021-06-24 | House | Presented To The Governor 06/24/2021 09:38 Am |
2021-06-22 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2021-06-22 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-06-22 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 355 Yeas 92 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-06-22 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2021-06-17 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2021-06-17 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 287 Yeas 33 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-05-05 | House | Transmitted |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 167 Yeas 93 Nays 15 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2021-05-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-04-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-03-23 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/18/2021 |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2021-03-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-18 | House | Introduced By Representative Graham Filler |